CHRISTCHURCH PRIORY BUILDING CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of Christian religion & education for the public benefit by the conservation, repair, maintenance, improvement, restoration and refurbishment of Christchurch Priory. Christchurch Priory means The Priory Church at Christchurch Dorset and its fabric, structure, fixtures, fittings, equipment, services monuments, decoration and ornaments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 06 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES STEWART | Chair | 21 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
Tracy Froud | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Colin Bacchus | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135 | £1.16k | £1.17m | £52.17k | £62.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.38k | £2.41k | £575 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.17m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.17m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £2.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09 JUL 2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19 NOV 2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE CONSERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT RESTORATION AND REFURBISHMENT OF CHRISTCHURCH PRIORY. "CHRISTCHURCH PRIORY" MEANS THE PRIORY CHURCH OF CHRISTCHURCH DORSET AND ITS FABRIC STRUCTURE FIXTURES FITTINGS EQUIPMENT SERVICES MONUMENTS DECORATION AND ORNAMENTS AND WHERE ANY SUCH WORKS AFFECT THE CHURCHYARD AND GROUNDS THOSE SHALL ALSO BE INCLUDED IN THAT DEFINITION.
Area of benefit
DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Priory House
Quay Road
CHRISTCHURCH
BH23 1BU
- Phone:
- 01202 485804
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window