Financial history KIDNEY RESEARCH YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1106412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £111.59k £208.64k £159.89k £67.76k £191.02k
Total expenditure £224.49k £90.68k £74.00k £191.63k £86.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A