THE SURAT SUNNI VOHRA WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106562
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 31 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 31 August 2019 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 25 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required