Financial history INET TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1105670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £67.28k £92.89k £74.78k £106.82k £98.49k
Total expenditure £64.72k £85.96k £70.85k £100.51k £74.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A