THE WESTIE RESCUE SCHEME LIMITED

Charity number: 1107970
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2021 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 March 2021 125 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 September 2016 On time Download