THE WINSTON NETTO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since 2002 activities of WNF were carried out by the Mr Antony Winston Netto ( now deceased ) and now by Dr C M Netto and Mr V Netto. Both secondary school and Master of Social Work students are supported financially/educationally/in interpersonal skills. They are encouraged to inculcate empathy for blind people and others less fortunate than themselves.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 04 February 2005: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY GIRLY NETTO | Trustee |
|
||||||
VIJAY NETTO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MANJU NETTO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £242 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2025 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 July 2023 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 April 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 17 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISABLED AND/OR NEEDY PEOPLE LIVING IN INDIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: * THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR STUDENTS TO ENABLE THEM TO UNDERTAKE GRADUATE AND /OR POST GRADUATE STUDIES AND TO WORK FOR THE RELIEF OF DISABLED AND/OR NEEDY PEOPLE * TO RELIEVE THE DISABLED AND/OR THOSE IN NEED PARTICULARLY WOMEN LIVING IN INDIA BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE. AT THEIR DISCRETION THE TRUSTEES MAY SPEND ALL OR PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 HEATHFIELD PARK
LONDON
NW2 5JE
- Phone:
- 07886703180
- Email:
- manju.netto@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window