Accounts and annual returns SOUTH MONTGOMERYSHIRE VOLUNTEER BUREAU LIMITED

Charity number: 1106188
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 188 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time