THE RIVERS TRUST

Charity number: 1107144
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.16m £1.29m £2.18m £1.61m £2.05m
Total expenditure £1.18m £1.46m £2.06m £1.65m £2.05m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.13m £1.98m £622.45k £202.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £205.73k £101.22k £115.00k £36.10k £62.45k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £46.25k £58.20k £35.71k £57.85k
Income - Charitable activities £932.28k £1.15m £2.01m £1.54m £1.93m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £615 £876 £83 £21 £26
Income - Other £18.33k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.46m £2.06m £1.56m £2.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £30.03k £171.02k £40.18k £12.34k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £22.46k £301.83k £808.01k £382.06k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £84.78k £50.41k