THE RIVERS TRUST

Charity number: 1107144
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Geoff Brighty Trustee 06 July 2016
NORFOLK RIVERS TRUST Received: On time
Jack William Arthur Spees Trustee 14 November 2017 None on record
Joanne Harrison Trustee 02 July 2019
COMMUNITY FOREST TRUST Received: On time
Charlotte Lucy Hitchmough Trustee 06 July 2016 None on record
DAVID BROWN Trustee None on record
Jonathan Mark White Chair 06 July 2016 None on record
DR Laurence Benjamin Couldrick Trustee 09 July 2015 None on record
Alastair William Muirhead Trustee 02 July 2019 None on record
GRAHAM THOMAS Trustee 30 June 2020
DIOCESAN COLLEGE TRUST Received: On time
AFRICAN MOUNTAIN RESEARCH FOUNDATION Recently registered
Dr Bella Davies Trustee 30 June 2020 None on record
ANDREW ROBERT WALLACE Trustee None on record