NORTHERN BAPTIST COLLEGE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ministerial training and other programmes of Christian education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 September 2009: Standard registration
- NORTHERN BAPTIST COLLEGE (TRUSTEE) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Lewis | Chair | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Janes | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Neil John Brighton | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luke Dowding | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
REV Glen Marshall | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Clara Rushbrook | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £345.88k | £350.23k | £428.10k | £226.76k | £371.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £421.87k | £412.74k | £406.39k | £369.81k | £463.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 OCTOBER 1956 AS AMENDED ON 8 DECEMBER 1965, BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 NOVEMBER 2004, AND CERTIFICATE ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 4 FEBRUARY 2005. as amended on 11 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION, PRIMARILY FOR CHRISTIAN PEOPLE, WITH A VIEW TO MINISTRY AND MISSION IN AND THROUGH BAPTIST CHURCHES IN GREAT BRITAIN AND WORLDWIDE, AND THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF RELIGION MAINTAINED BY BAPTIST CHURCHES AS SET FORTH IN THE "DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLE" ADOPTED FROM TIME TO TIME IN THE CONSTITUTION OF THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN, SHALL BE TAUGHT ("THE PRIMARY OBJECT).
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND WORLDWIDE.
Linked charities
- 01 September 2009 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHERN BAPTIST COLLEGE
Luther King House
Brighton Grove
Rusholme
MANCHESTER
M14 5JP
- Phone:
- 01612446404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window