Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL ALLOTMENT GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1108147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 26 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required