THE FRIENDS OF ST MABYN CHURCH

Charity number: 1105840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 08 February 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 15 February 2019 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 14 February 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 08 February 2017 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required