Financial history THE GARGRAVE SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £10.74k £18.95k £0 £11.00k £10.41k
Total expenditure £739 £9.33k £1.05k £7.28k £1.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.64k N/A £10.96k N/A