CHILDREACH INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1106490
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 JUNE 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 5 OCTOBER 2004 AND AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD 2. TO PROMOTE CHILD RIGHTS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT 3. TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THE PUBLIC WITH A VIEW TO FOSTERING AN APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHALLENGES FACED BY CHILDREN AROUND THE WORLD
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 28 October 2004 : registered
  • 27 July 2011 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (S.74))
Other names
  • GLOBAL DEVELOPMENT LINKS (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Other Charitable Activities