Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CE PRIMARYSCHOOL DILWYN

Charity number: 1105882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 July 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 August 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required