YEW TREE FARM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1106214
Charity reporting is overdue by 1823 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £4.95k £4.94k £12.59k £9.71k £8.18k
Total expenditure £7.13k £6.59k £7.83k £8.54k £11.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A