FOLKESTONE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1105922
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED 20 JANUARY 2005 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING A SCHOOL OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH EMPHASES ON PARTICULAR SPECIALISMS ('THE ACADEMY').
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 16 September 2004 : registered
  • 25 August 2011 : removed (EXEMPT CHARITY)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services