ST LUKE'S PTA

Charity number: 1105972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 06 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 28 June 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 26 June 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required