ST LUKE'S PTA

Charity number: 1105972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.22k £4.21k £7.14k £8.43k £1.85k
Total expenditure £2.64k £2.31k £2.04k £3.50k £503
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A