AFRICAN SMILE

Charity number: 1109354
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 01/11/2014 01/04/2016 30/08/2017 30/08/2018
Total gross income £15.60k £8.00k £8.62k £8.56k £21.60k
Total expenditure £15.34k £7.95k £8.45k £8.51k £21.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0