FIND (FAMILIES IN NEED) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide relief to the poor and homeless by way of re-distributing household goods, carpets,furniture and white electrical goods (new and secondhand). Provide food hampers at Christmas and throughout year where needed. A comprehensive Food Bank is operated.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAUREEN DOROTHY ANN REYNEL | Chair |
|
||||||
Beverley Roddie | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Watson | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|||||
John Michael Button | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Carrington-Porter | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Burton | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Derek Nicholas Austin | Trustee |
|
||||||
MISS HEATHER CADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.82k | £452.76k | £296.56k | £318.83k | £297.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.42k | £118.45k | £156.45k | £200.27k | £164.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.70k | £7.00k | £15.00k | £11.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF IPSWICH AND A 35 MILE RADIUS THEREOF OF PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL, FAMILY OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR BY REASON OF ILLNESS, DISABILITY OR HANDICAP ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, MONEY AND FACILITIES AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS (INCLUDING FOOD, FUEL, CLOTHING, TOOLS, FURNITURE, BEDDING, SAFETY EQUIPMENT, HEATING, COOKING OR WASHING APPLIANCES AND SUCH OTHER ITEMS AS MAY BE NEEDED)
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF IPSWICH AND A 35 MILE RADIUS
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 CHEQUERS RISE
GREAT BLAKENHAM
IPSWICH
IP6 0LT
- Phone:
- 01473833351
- Email:
- maureen.find1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
findipswich.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window