EMAN FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1106916
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 01 April 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 01 April 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 27 March 2021 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 27 March 2021 361 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 22 May 2019 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 22 May 2019 52 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 07 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 07 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 13 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 13 June 2016 On time Download