DARTMOOR SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM (PLYMOUTH)

Charity number: 1106095

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Hayter Trustee 07 July 2021 None on record
Dennis Hendricus Diederik Verheule Trustee 20 November 2018 None on record
NEIL WAYNE PARSONS Trustee 05 February 2019 None on record
David William Kent Trustee 07 July 2021 None on record
CLARE GODFREY Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
SIMON MATHEW APPLEBEE Trustee 28 March 2018 None on record
Stephen Michael Rose Chair 07 July 2021 None on record
STEVE LANG Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
DARREN PLATTS Trustee 28 March 2017 None on record