ACTION FOR SILVERDALE CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1106108
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £7.83k £500 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.56k £521 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A