Governing document SPEKE AERODROME HERITAGE GROUP
Charity Number: 1106923

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 30 OCTOBER 2004, 29 JANUARY 2006, 28 JANUARY 2007, 8 MARCH 2009 AND 17 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) IN MERSEYSIDE BY PRESERVING, MAINTAINING, OPERATING AND EXHIBITING THE GREAT BRITISH AIRCRAFT, JETSTREAM 41 004 G-JMAC AND OTHER AIRCRAFT WHERE APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MERSEYSIDE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.