REWRITE

Charity number: 1109901
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £88.28k £119.23k £93.26k £28.16k £13.11k
Total expenditure £86.91k £90.68k £109.25k £63.76k £25.59k
Income from government contracts £18.00k £17.52k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A