BLACKBURN YMCA

Charity number: 1106198
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 January 2017 On time Download