BLACKBURN YMCA

Charity number: 1106198
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £299.10k £279.09k £247.68k £450.68k £435.69k
Total expenditure £290.49k £270.07k £203.86k £317.79k £328.56k
Income from government contracts £1.50k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £12.81k N/A N/A N/A