A.S.I.A. (ACADEMY OF SOUTH INDIAN ARTS)

Charity number: 1106510
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE AND PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN, DISABLED PERSONS AND THE ELDERLY, IN THE APPRECIATION, PRACTICE AND PRESENTATION OF CLASSICAL SOUTH INDIAN PERFORMING ARTS. (2) TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR, ENCOURAGE AND FACILITATE PARTICIPATION OF INDIVIDUALS THROUGH EXHIBITIONS, WORKSHOPS, ARTS FESTIVALS, PROFESSIONAL AND AMATEUR PERFORMANCES AND PRESENTATIONS WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING INTEGRATION AND INCLUSION. THE CHARITY'S AREA OF OPERATION WILL BE IN ENGLAND AND WALES..
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 29 October 2004 : registered
  • 11 July 2011 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
  • 23 August 2011 : re-registered
  • 05 December 2019 : removed (CEASED TO EXIST)
Other names
  • A.S.I.A. (Working name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Services