SOCIETY OF ST LUKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Visiting individuals or receiving them at the HQs. Fund raising, social events, training events and providing a place of quiet and refreshment in a spiritual environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Jordan
- Lebanon
Governance
- 17 December 2004: Standard registration
- SSL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FATHER ANDREW HARRY JOHN LANE MBE BA SSL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Penny Jefferies | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAT BAGGALEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REVD SISTER JULIE WISEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.89k | £6.82k | £4.92k | £6.81k | £5.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.44k | £3.05k | £7.45k | £6.45k | £7.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED 26 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF AS SET OUT IN THE CONSTITUTION. 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF "FATHER ANDEWEG INSTITUTE FOR DEAF" IN BEIRUT, LEBANON AND " THE HOLY LAND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF" IN SALT, JORDAN.
Area of benefit
FATHER ANDEWEG INSTITUTE FOR DEAF" IN BEIRUT, LEBANON AND " THE HOLY LAND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF" IN SALT, JORDAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32B BEESTON COMMON
SHERINGHAM
NR26 8ES
- Phone:
- 01263825623
- Email:
- ssluke@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window