Accounts and annual returns ASSOCIATION OF BRITISH-NIGERIAN LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS (ABLE)

Charity number: 1107580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 July 2018 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required