Financial history ASSOCIATION OF BRITISH-NIGERIAN LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS (ABLE)

Charity number: 1107580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.57k £1.31k £1.54k £1.54k £1.23k
Total expenditure £832 £456 £1.12k £1.21k £302
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A