Accounts and annual returns MOSELEY RUGBY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required