Financial history MOSELEY RUGBY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1107396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.09k £90.25k £110.53k £99.19k £18.92k
Total expenditure £17.20k £54.13k £105.28k £98.93k £18.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.00k £25.70k N/A £5.19k