YMCA BATH GROUP

Charity number: 1106370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 September 2016 On time Download