THE BOAZ TRUST

Charity number: 1110344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 October 2016 On time Download