THE BOAZ TRUST

Charity number: 1110344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £479.33k £587.11k £459.64k £565.12k £610.01k
Total expenditure £421.01k £417.62k £488.56k £535.75k £570.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k £0 £1.00k £200
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £508.57k N/A £458.41k £365.51k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £473 N/A £284 £254
Income - Charitable activities N/A £77.35k N/A £105.77k £243.54k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £717 N/A £657 £708
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £10.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £392.97k N/A £500.63k £533.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £24.66k N/A £35.12k £37.01k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.86k N/A £2.23k £2.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0