THE BOAZ TRUST

Charity number: 1110344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MIKE ARUNDALE Trustee None on record
DAVID MARTIN TOMLINSON Trustee 09 January 2012
ACTING ON IMPULSE Received: On time
MARTIN DAVID PALMER Trustee 16 November 2012 None on record
SUZANNAH SAMMONS Trustee 16 November 2012 None on record
Rev PHILIP RAWLINGS Chair 09 January 2012
WORD OF LIFE Received: On time
Chenai Mudzamiri Trustee 20 March 2016 None on record
ROGER PHILLIPS Trustee 21 June 2015 None on record
David Smith Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record