DEPAUL INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1107385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £25.20m £27.86m £36.83m £39.21m £40.28m
Total expenditure £24.69m £27.72m £33.54m £37.79m £39.59m
Income from government contracts £6.06m £7.70m £1.48m £4.99m £1.79m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.48m £2.76m £6.92m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.67m £5.17m £6.96m £7.78m £7.94m
Income - Other trading activities £213.00k £317.00k £384.00k £436.00k £858.00k
Income - Charitable activities £20.29m £21.96m £26.89m £28.08m £28.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.00k £8.00k £39.00k £6.00k £16.00k
Income - Other £25.00k £406.00k £2.56m £2.91m £2.98m
Income - Legacies £6.00k £1.20m £145.00k £445.00k £237.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £22.98m £25.92m £30.75m £35.16m £36.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.80m £2.24m £2.63m £3.01m
Expenditure - Governance £122.00k £120.00k £0 £93.00k £128.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £120.00k £0 £548.00k £0 £0