DEPAUL INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1107385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SISTER MARGARET BARRETT DC Trustee None on record
Rev Aidan Rooney C.M. Trustee 26 June 2019 None on record
JOHN CHARLES DARLEY Chair
CATHOLIC AGENCY FOR OVERSEAS DEVELOPMENT Received: On time
ADRIAN ABEL Trustee 26 January 2017
THE VINCENTIAN VOLUNTEERS LIMITED Received: On time
FATHER VITALIY NOVAK Trustee 23 January 2013 None on record
John Murphy Trustee 29 April 2020 None on record
Andrew Joseph Campbell Clark Trustee 16 October 2019 None on record
Patrick Mark Silvester Litton Trustee 02 July 2014
ST ETHELDREDA'S WITH ST CLEMENT'S FULHAM PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL Received: On time
THE ANGLICAN-LUTHERAN SOCIETY Received: On time
BRITISH COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF ISTANBUL Received: On time
HEIDI MARIA KRUITWAGEN Trustee 16 August 2012 None on record