NEPHROTIC SYNDROME TRUST (NEST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise awareness of Nephrotic Syndrome and raise funds for further research and development by the research team at Bristol Royal Children's Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 2005: Standard registration
- NEST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY COOK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Wen Yi DING | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandie Jenkins | Trustee | 25 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gavin Welsh | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mathias-Lukins | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Benson | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOIN SALEEM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN YEARSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.69k | £109.82k | £123.68k | £108.76k | £58.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.54k | £129.53k | £79.49k | £120.44k | £116.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 21 October 2020 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 21 October 2020 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 19 DECEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 20 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION AND FUNDING OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT FOR NEPHROTIC SYNDROME CARRIED OUT AT BRISTOL UNIVERSITY LABORATORIES.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 SOUTHWAY DRIVE
YEOVIL
BA21 3ED
- Phone:
- 01935 434217
- Email:
- wendy@nstrust.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window