Financial history THE FRIENDS OF TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK

Charity number: 1107136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £144.91k £180.92k £221.80k £238.79k £212.18k
Total expenditure £148.72k £148.05k £162.66k £189.51k £199.84k
Income from government contracts N/A £14.85k £31.90k £31.90k £23.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A