Governing document THE FRIENDS OF TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 03 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND MAINTAIN THE LANDSCAPE OF THE TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK AND ACKROYD DRIVE GREENLINK LOCAL NATURE RESERVE (THE "CEMETERY PARK") INCLUDING ITS MONUMENTS AND BIODIVERSITY AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC IMPORTANCE AND NATURE RESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE LIVING, WORKING OR STUDYING IN TOWER HAMLETS THROUGH PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES PROVIDED BY THE CHARITY, AND BY PARTNERING ORGANISATIONS WHOSE AIMS ARE COMPLEMENTARY TO THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.