Trustees THE FRIENDS OF TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK

Charity number: 1107136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Toby Sibley Chair 20 September 2018
None on record
Louise Robinson Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Jasmina Negrini Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Karen Baxter Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Diane Gibb Trustee 15 January 2021
None on record
Guy Mitchell Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Sally Randall Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Colin Wiseman Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
MARILYN BALTUTIS Trustee 16 November 2012
None on record
DIANE KENDALL Trustee
None on record
DOREEN KENDALL Trustee
None on record
Sigrid Werner Trustee
None on record