ST JOHN'S ROMAN CATHOLIC SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1106467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £7.71k £8.97k £5.30k £9.52k £5.61k
Total expenditure £8.27k £7.66k £6.98k £11.44k £3.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A