Accounts and annual returns GOSPEL FOR TRIBALS SOCIAL SERVICE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1107428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 25 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 28 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 28 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 01 October 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 October 2018 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 02 October 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 02 October 2017 2 days late Download Open in new window