INSTITUTE OF IMAGINATION

Charity number: 1109276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Reilly Trustee 09 January 2014 None on record
MICHELLE DORION Trustee None on record
Laura Jane Watson Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
Charles Michael Metcalfe Trustee 20 May 2019 None on record
KATE GRUSSING Trustee 17 July 2013 None on record
Ashley Shaw Scott Adjaye Trustee 20 May 2019 None on record
Lynne Elizabeth GUYTON Trustee 20 May 2019 None on record
RICHARD WAYNE LEWIS Trustee 31 May 2012
ROYAL NATIONAL CHILDREN'S SPRINGBOARD FOUNDATION Received: On time
BLACK EQUITY ORGANISATION (BEO) Recently registered
BLACK HEART FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED Received: On time
ULI CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
ROYAL WANSTEAD SCHOOL Received: On time
BASIL JAMES DEMEROUTIS Chair None on record
Bethany Koby-Hirschmann Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
DIANA ELIZABETH ANNE UEHLEIN Trustee None on record