Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HOPE FOR AFRICA MISSIONS

Charity number: 1107368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window