Financial history FRIENDS OF HOPE FOR AFRICA MISSIONS

Charity number: 1107368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £49.09k £41.13k £78.12k £23.72k £44.34k
Total expenditure £54.58k £53.96k £64.14k £27.61k £39.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A