RINGWOOD CARERS' GROUP IN CONJUNCTION WITH CHURCHES TOGETHER

Charity number: 1107545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £314 £176 £157 £1.27k £1.49k
Total expenditure £1.13k £826 £247 £714 £123
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A